IL HB5970 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 10 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-15 - Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Safe Spaces in Public Places Act. Defines terms. Provides that beginning with the 2019-2020 academic year, each institution of higher learning must install and operate a walk-through metal detector at each public entrance of the institution and during any special event on any campus of the institution if more than 1,000 people are present at the event. Amends the Officers and Employees Article of the Counties Code. Provides that as part of his or her duty to maintain the security of a courthouse, a sheriff shall maintain a walk-through metal detector at each point of entry into the courthouse. Provides that a courthouse shall ensure that all members of the public, other than employees of the county or individuals who display proper credentials, who enter the courthouse at a point of entry are subjected to screening by a walk-through metal detector. Amends the School Code. Provides that beginning with the 2019-2020 school year, a school board shall require each school under its authority to install and operate a walk-through metal detector at all public entrances of the school. Amends the Hospital Licensing Act. Provides that a hospital shall maintain a metal detector at each point of entry into the hospital; defines "point of entry". Provides that a hospital shall ensure that all members of the public, other than the employees of the hospital who display proper credentials, who enter the hospital at a point of entry are subjected to screening by a metal detector. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WALK-THROUGH METAL DETECTORS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-15HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-11-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-11-07HouseFirst Reading
2018-10-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-10-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-10-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-20.68New CodeSee Bill Text
105534-18.61New CodeSee Bill Text
210857.7New CodeSee Bill Text
5553-6023Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback