IL HB5969 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-03 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-03 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Compassionate Use of Medical Cannabis Pilot Program Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
HEALTH-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-03 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-11-29 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-11-29 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-11-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-11-29 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 014-000-000 |
2016-11-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote |
2016-11-29 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2016-11-29 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Higher Education Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-11-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2016-11-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-11-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
2016-11-28 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 130 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |