IL HB5965 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the Office of the State Treasurer for its FY13 ordinary and contingent expenses. Effective July 1, 2012.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$TREASURER-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-01-08HouseSession Sine Die
2012-07-27HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2012-02-29HouseAssigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee
2012-02-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2012-02-28HouseFirst Reading
2012-02-24HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2012-02-24HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback