IL HB5959 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that each candidate for Governor, Lieutenant Governor, Secretary of State, Comptroller, Treasurer, or Attorney General shall, at the time he or she files a statement of candidacy for that position, file a Statement of Nondisclosure Agreements. Provides that the Statement of Nondisclosure Agreements shall disclose whether or not the candidate is a party to, a signatory to, or a beneficiary of any nondisclosure agreement at the time of the filing.
Title
ELEC CD-NONDISCLOSURE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-11-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-11-07 | House | First Reading |
2018-09-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2018-09-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Grant Wehrli |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 10-5.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 7-10.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5959&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5959.htm |