IL HB5957 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Introduced on September 17 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-07 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Commission on Fiscal Responsibility and Reform Act. Provides that the Commission on Fiscal Responsibility and Reform shall consist of 18 voting members. Provides for the appointment of the members. Provides that the Commission shall undertake a review of executive branch State agencies and provide recommendations for improvement. Provides that the Commission shall submit a report to the Governor and the General Assembly. Creates the Commission on Fiscal Responsibility and Reform Fund, which may receive gifts, grants, and donations from any lawful source. Provides that moneys in the Fund shall be used by the Commission exclusively for public purposes. Provides that the Commission on Fiscal Responsibility and Reform shall operate as a 501(c)(4) entity under the federal Internal Revenue Code. Repeals the Act on October 1, 2020. Amends the State Finance Act to create the Commission on Fiscal Responsibility and Reform Fund. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COMM ON FISCAL RESPONSIBILITY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-11-07HouseFirst Reading
2018-10-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2018-10-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-10-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-10-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-10-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2018-10-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-09-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2018-09-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-09-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-09-17HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Steven Reick

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301055.886New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback