IL HB5953 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, if a taxpayer must have an income that is at or below a certain amount in order to qualify for an exemption, then, for the purposes of that exemption, the term "income" does not include Social Security benefits unless expressly stated otherwise. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-SOCIAL SECURITY INCOME
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-05-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger |
2014-05-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher |
2014-02-21 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 15-172 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 15-175 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 15-177 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 15-7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5953&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB5953.htm |