IL HB5952 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that if, at any time, a facility is emitting ethylene oxide at a level higher than the standards set forth by specified provisions of the federal Clean Air Act or by the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency under specified provisions of the Environmental Protection Act, then the facility shall immediately cease operations until sufficient changes are made to reduce the level of such emissions below both federal and State standards. Effective immediately.
Title
EPA-ETHYLENE OXIDE EMISSIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-11-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-11-07 | House | First Reading |
2018-10-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-08-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5952&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5952.htm |