IL HB5946 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Introduced on August 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-07 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Police Act. Provides that the Department of State Police shall establish, by rule, a standing security protocol for the use of a three-dimensional printer located on the property of a public library, elementary or secondary school, college, community college, or State agency as defined in the Illinois State Auditing Act on or before January 1, 2019. Provides that each entity shall implement the standing security protocol adopted by the Department on or before July 1, 2019. Provides that to the extent that the standing security protocol conflicts with the use a three-dimensional printer for legitimate academic research, a waiver may be issued by the head of the entity or the head of the department of that entity for its continued use. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ST POLICE-3D PRINTER PROTOCOL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-11-07HouseFirst Reading
2018-09-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-09-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-09-17HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-09-17HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-09-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-09-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-09-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-09-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-09-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-09-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-08-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-08-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-08-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-08-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-08-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-08-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-08-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-08-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-08-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-08-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-08-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-08-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2018-08-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2018-08-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Steven A. Andersson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20261025New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback