IL HB5937 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on August 2 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-07 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Downstate Teachers and State Universities Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. Requires an employer to make an additional employer contribution for a participant whose earnings for any academic year used to determine the final rate of earnings exceed the amount of his or her earnings with the same employer for the previous academic year by more than 6% (instead of 3%). Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-EMPLOYER CONTRIBUTIONS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-11-07HouseFirst Reading
2018-08-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-08-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-08-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-08-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-08-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-08-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-08-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-08-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-08-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-08-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-08-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-08-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-08-02HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40515-155Amended CodeCitation Text
40516-158Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback