IL HB5936 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 2 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-13 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Tax Increment Allocation Redevelopment Act of the Illinois Municipal Code. Creates a tax increment allocation financing extension for an ordinance adopted on July 2, 1996 by the Village of Manlius. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TIF-VILLAGE OF MANLIUS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-11-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-11-07HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-11-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-11-07HouseFirst Reading
2018-08-02HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Swanson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
65511-74.4-3.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback