IL HB5934 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on July 23 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-08-02 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amends Public Act 100-586. Repeals an appropriation from the Road Fund to the Department of Transportation for a grant to the Chicago Department of Transportation for infrastructure improvements. Adds the same amount to an appropriation from the Road Fund for construction and land acquisition. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$ROAD FUND-INFRASTRUCTURE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2018-08-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-08-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2018-07-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-07-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2018-07-23HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback