IL HB5931 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-1)
Status: Failed on November 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-17 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-1)
Status: Failed on November 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-17 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act and the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the Department of Human Services shall establish reimbursement rates which build toward livable wages for front line personnel in residential and day programs serving persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities, including but not limited to intermediate care facilities for persons with developmental disabilities, community integrated living arrangements, developmental training programs, employment, and other residential and day programs for persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities supported by State funds or funding under Title XIX of the federal Social Security Act. Provides that the Department shall increase rates and reimbursements so that direct support persons earn a base wage of not less than $15 per hour and so that other front line personnel earn a commensurate wage. Defines "front line personnel". Effective immediately.
Title
DEV DISABLED-DSP-WAGES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-11-16 - House - Motion in House (Y: 64 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 43 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 43 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-17 | House | Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken |
2016-11-16 | House | Override Governor Veto - House Lost 064-042-000 |
2016-11-16 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2016-11-15 | House | Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2016-11-02 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2016-11-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Total Veto |
2016-08-26 | House | Governor Vetoed |
2016-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 040-018-000 |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2016-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 26, 2016 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 006-003-000 |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Linda Holmes |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-05-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-043-000 |
2016-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2016-05-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2016-05-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2016-05-04 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed |
2016-05-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-03 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-03 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2016-05-02 | House | Balanced Budget Note Filed |
2016-04-26 | House | Judicial Note Filed |
2016-04-26 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed |
2016-04-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-22 | House | Correctional Note Filed |
2016-04-21 | House | State Debt Impact Note Filed |
2016-04-21 | House | State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2016-04-21 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2016-04-21 | House | Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2016-04-21 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2016-04-21 | House | Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2016-04-21 | House | Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2016-04-21 | House | Pension Note Filed |
2016-04-21 | House | Home Rule Note Filed |
2016-04-21 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2016-04-20 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2016-04-20 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-20 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2016-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2016-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2016-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2016-04-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2016-04-14 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Ed Sullivan |
2016-04-14 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Ed Sullivan |
2016-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 011-008-000 |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2016-04-08 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 22, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew F Skoog |
2016-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2016-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2016-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2016-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2016-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2016-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1705 | 55.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5.4i | New Code | See Bill Text |