IL HB5929 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Introduced on July 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-07 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Downstate Teacher and Chicago Teacher Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that none of the benefits provided for in either Article shall be paid to a person if the person first becomes a member after the effective date of the amendatory Act and a board, after an administrative hearing, determines that the person sexually abused a student. Provides that an employer must notify a board if a retiring member has been accused of sexually abusing a student. Provides that a board may, through an administrative hearing, review the claim of sexual abuse and may order that benefits be forfeited. Provides that the changes made by the amendatory Act shall not operate to impair any contract or vested right acquired before the effective date of the amendatory Act nor to preclude the right to a refund. Provides that all teachers entering service after the effective date of the amendatory Act shall be deemed to have consented to the provisions of the amendatory Act as a condition of membership. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-TEACHERS-FORFEITURE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-09-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-08-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-08-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2018-08-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-08-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2018-08-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2018-08-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-08-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi
2018-07-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-07-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2018-07-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Steven Reick

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40516-169.1Amended CodeCitation Text
40516-169.2New CodeSee Bill Text
40516-199Amended CodeCitation Text
40517-143.5Amended CodeCitation Text
40517-143.6New CodeSee Bill Text
40517-149.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback