IL HB5928 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on July 3 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-07 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Pyrotechnic Use Act of 2018. Provides that display fireworks shall only be offered for sale, exposed for sale, sold at retail, or kept with intent to sell, possess, use, or explode under a permit with specific requirements, a specific license, or for a specific use. Provides requirements for selling consumer fireworks. Provides that the State Fire Marshal may revoke the registration of any seller of consumer fireworks if the seller violates the requirements. Provides the requirements for use of consumer fireworks. Provides exemptions. Provides the procedure regarding the seizure and sale of fireworks that are stored and held in violation of the Act. Provides requirements for the storage of consumer fireworks and display fireworks. Defines terms. Makes conforming changes. Repeals the Pyrotechnic Use Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PYROTECHNIC USE ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-11-07HouseFirst Reading
2018-07-16HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2018-07-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2018-07-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2018-07-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2018-07-03HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2252275Amended CodeCitation Text
42535ActRepealed CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback