IL HB5928 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Pyrotechnic Use Act of 2018. Provides that display fireworks shall only be offered for sale, exposed for sale, sold at retail, or kept with intent to sell, possess, use, or explode under a permit with specific requirements, a specific license, or for a specific use. Provides requirements for selling consumer fireworks. Provides that the State Fire Marshal may revoke the registration of any seller of consumer fireworks if the seller violates the requirements. Provides the requirements for use of consumer fireworks. Provides exemptions. Provides the procedure regarding the seizure and sale of fireworks that are stored and held in violation of the Act. Provides requirements for the storage of consumer fireworks and display fireworks. Defines terms. Makes conforming changes. Repeals the Pyrotechnic Use Act. Effective immediately.
Title
PYROTECHNIC USE ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-11-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-11-07 | House | First Reading |
2018-07-16 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2018-07-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2018-07-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2018-07-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2018-07-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 227 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
425 | 35 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5928&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5928.htm |