IL HB5924 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. Repeals the Code on July 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TAX CODE-REPEAL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-08HouseSession Sine Die
2018-11-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-11-07HouseFirst Reading
2018-07-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2018-06-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-06-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-06-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2018-06-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-06-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2018-06-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-06-27HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520032-25New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback