IL HB5924 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Repeals the Code on July 1, 2019.
Title
PROP TAX CODE-REPEAL
Sponsors
Rep. James Durkin [R] | Rep. Grant Wehrli [R] | Rep. Thomas Morrison [R] | Rep. David Olsen [R] |
Rep. Brad Halbrook [R] | Rep. Allen Skillicorn [R] | Rep. Margo McDermed [R] | Rep. Christine Winger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-11-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-11-07 | House | First Reading |
2018-07-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2018-06-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-06-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2018-06-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2018-06-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-06-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2018-06-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2018-06-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5924&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5924.htm |