IL HB5924 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-10)
Status: Passed on August 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0821
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Probate Act of 1975. Provides that upon petition by an adult child, the court may order the guardian to permit visitation between the ward and the adult child if the court finds that the visitation is in the ward's best interests. Provides that the court shall order the guardian to keep the adult children of the ward informed of hospitalizations of the ward, the death of the ward, and burial arrangements for the ward unless the court finds on its own motion or upon petition by the guardian that limiting such disclosure is in the best interests of the ward. Provides that if the issue of whether disclosure is in the best interests of the ward, the adult child has the right to a hearing upon the issue of whether to limit disclosure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROBATE-ADULT CHILDREN OF WARD

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-08-15HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0821
2016-08-15HouseEffective Date January 1, 2017
2016-08-15HouseGovernor Approved
2016-06-27HouseSent to the Governor
2016-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2016-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
2016-05-27SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016
2016-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2016
2016-05-17SenateSecond Reading
2016-05-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2016
2016-05-11SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 007-000-000
2016-05-03SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2016-04-20SenateReferred to Assignments
2016-04-20SenateFirst Reading
2016-04-20SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2016-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2016-04-20SenateArrive in Senate
2016-04-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
2016-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2016-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2016-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2016-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2016-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey
2016-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2016-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew F Skoog
2016-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2016-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2016-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2016-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2016-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2016-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2016-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2016-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2016-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2016-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2016-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt
2016-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2016-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2016-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2016-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2016-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2016-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2016-04-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2016-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2016-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2016-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2016-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2016-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2016-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2016-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2016-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2016-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony
2016-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2016-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2016-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2016-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2016-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2016-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2016-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2016-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2016-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2016-04-15HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2016-04-15HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2016-04-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000
2016-04-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2016-04-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2016-04-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine
2016-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2016-04-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2016-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2016-04-05HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000
2016-03-23HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2016-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2016-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2016-02-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2016-02-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-02-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
755511a-17Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback