IL HB5923 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Introduced on June 25 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-19 - Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that the State Superintendent of Education has the authority to initiate a suspension of or revoke the license of any educator licensed under the Educator Licensure Article of the Code if he or she negligently fails to report an instance of suspected child abuse or neglect. Provides that, except for an educator licensed under the Educator Licensure Article of the Code, if a school board determines that any school district employee has willfully or negligently failed to report an instance of suspected child abuse or neglect, as required by the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act, then the school board may dismiss that employee immediately upon that determination. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-SEX ABUSE-FAIL TO REPRT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-19HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-09-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-09-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-08-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-08-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2018-08-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-08-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-08-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2018-08-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-08-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2018-08-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-07-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-06-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2018-06-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-06-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Steven Reick

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-23.12Amended CodeCitation Text
105521B-75Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-18.6Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback