IL HB5922 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-22 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-22 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that if the filing fee is not tendered at the time the complainant presents the complaint, the complaint shall not be accepted. Provides that if the complaint is received between 31 and 15 days before an election about which the complaint is filed, then the State Board of Elections shall, at a minimum, hold the closed preliminary hearing and make the determination of whether the complaint was filed upon justifiable grounds, prior to the election. Provides that complaints involving any conduct that relates to an upcoming election shall not be accepted 14 or fewer business days before that election. Provides that, in other cases, the Board shall render its final judgment within 60 days of the date the complaint is filed. Effective immediately.
Title
ELEC CD-VERIFIED COMPLAINTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-08 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 22, 2016 |
2016-02-23 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 9-21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5922&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB5922.htm |