IL HB5914 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1271
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1271
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Eliminates provision that permits the Prisoner Review Board to revoke parole for persons committed under the Juvenile Court Act or the Juvenile Court Act of 1987 and to recommit them until the age of 21 for violations of parole. Provides that the Board may require persons committed under the Juvenile Court Act of 1987 to be continued on the existing term without modifying or enlarging the conditions of parole, unless the minor is found guilty beyond a reasonable doubt of violating a condition of parole by a juvenile court following a due process hearing with counsel for the minor. Provides that if the court finds the minor guilty of violating parole, the court shall conduct a hearing to determine if it is in the best interest of the minor and the public to recommit the minor to the Department of Juvenile Justice. Provides that if the minor is recommitted, the minor shall be eligible for release within 30 days, and shall in no event be reconfined for longer than 60 days.
Title
CD CORR-JUV PAROLE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 81 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 81 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-26 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1271 | |
2010-07-26 | Effective Date January 1, 2011 | |
2010-07-26 | Governor Approved | |
2010-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-30 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-04-30 | Third Reading - Passed; 043-007-000 | |
2010-04-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2010 | |
2010-04-23 | Second Reading | |
2010-04-22 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 23, 2010 | |
2010-04-22 | Do Pass Criminal Law; 005-002-000 | |
2010-04-13 | Assigned to Criminal Law | |
2010-04-06 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-06 | First Reading | |
2010-04-06 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul | |
2010-04-06 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-04-06 | Arrive in Senate | |
2010-03-25 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40(a) | |
2010-03-25 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 081-032-000 | |
2010-03-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-23 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2010-03-22 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Juvenile Justice Reform Committee; 005-000-000 | |
2010-03-22 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Juvenile Justice Reform Committee | |
2010-03-22 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Juvenile Justice Reform Committee | |
2010-03-19 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-19 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Annazette Collins | |
2010-03-18 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-18 | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-17 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-17 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-17 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Annazette Collins | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-03 | Do Pass / Short Debate Juvenile Justice Reform Committee; 005-003-000 | |
2010-02-16 | Assigned to Juvenile Justice Reform Committee | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-10 | First Reading | |
2010-02-10 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Annazette Collins |