IL HB5899 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0938
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State's Attorneys Appellate Prosecutor's Act to require the Board of Governors of the Office of the State's Attorneys Appellate Prosecutor to establish a committee to evaluate and recommend a best practices protocol on specific issues related to investigation and prosecution of serious criminal offenses. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SAAP-BEST PRACTICES PROTOCOL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-08-15HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0938
2014-08-15HouseEffective Date August 15, 2014
2014-08-15HouseGovernor Approved
2014-06-20HouseSent to the Governor
2014-05-23HousePassed Both Houses
2014-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2014-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2014
2014-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2014-04-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 1, 2014
2014-04-30SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2014-04-03SenateReferred to Assignments
2014-04-03SenateFirst Reading
2014-04-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2014-04-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 3, 2014
2014-04-02SenateArrive in Senate
2014-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2014-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente
2014-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2014-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks
2014-04-02HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2014-03-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2014-03-27HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2014-03-25HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2014-03-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary; 016-000-000
2014-02-27HouseAssigned to Judiciary
2014-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2014-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2014-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7252104.12New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback