IL HB5882 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-11)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-28 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Makes appropriations and reappropriations for the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2018. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$FY19 CAPITAL QUINCY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2018-05-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-05-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-05-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-05-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-05-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2018-05-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-05-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2018-05-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2018-05-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-05-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-05-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-05-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-05-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-05-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-05-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-05-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2018-05-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-05-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-05-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-05-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-05-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-05-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-05-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2018-05-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-05-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2018-05-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-05-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2018-05-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-05-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-05-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-05-21HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-21HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-18HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Randy E. Frese

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback