IL HB5881 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Community College Act. Allows the Board of Trustees of Community College District No. 508 to establish and offer at Malcolm X College and the Board of Trustees of Community College District No. 536 to establish and offer at Lewis and Clark Community College a baccalaureate-level nursing education pilot program that confers a bachelor of science degree in nursing upon the meeting of specified conditions. Requires the Illinois Community College Board to conduct a statewide evaluation of the nursing program and report on the results of the evaluation by July 1, 2023; specifies evaluation requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NURSING DEGREE PILOT PROGRAM

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-21HouseAssigned to Community College Access & Affordability Committee
2018-05-21HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-21HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-18HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Monica Bristow

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1108053-80New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback