IL HB5881 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Community College Act. Allows the Board of Trustees of Community College District No. 508 to establish and offer at Malcolm X College and the Board of Trustees of Community College District No. 536 to establish and offer at Lewis and Clark Community College a baccalaureate-level nursing education pilot program that confers a bachelor of science degree in nursing upon the meeting of specified conditions. Requires the Illinois Community College Board to conduct a statewide evaluation of the nursing program and report on the results of the evaluation by July 1, 2023; specifies evaluation requirements.
Title
NURSING DEGREE PILOT PROGRAM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-21 | House | Assigned to Community College Access & Affordability Committee |
2018-05-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-21 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Monica Bristow |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5881&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5881.htm |