IL HB5880 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-22 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-22 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Appraisal Management Company Registration Act. Provides that no appraisal management company may require an appraiser to pay the national registry fee required by the Appraisal Subcommittee of the Federal Financial Institutions Examination Council for a person who is (i) on the appraisal panel of the appraisal management company and (ii) certified as an appraiser in this State.
Title
APPRAISERS-REGISTRY FEE
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Rita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2016-04-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2016-04-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ed Sullivan |
2016-04-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ed Sullivan |
2016-04-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 010-000-000 |
2016-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote |
2016-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2016-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 459 | 165 | Amended Code | Citation Text |