IL HB5880 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Emergency Medical Services (EMS) Systems Act. Prohibits the Department of Public Health from implementing the U.S. Department of Transportation National Emergency Medical Services (EMS) Education Standards until expressly authorized to do so by the General Assembly. Provides that an EMT-B, EMT-I, or EMT-P may perform emergency or non-emergency medical services, in accordance with his or her level of education, training, and licensure, regardless of the level or type of vehicle (for example, an ambulance or other type of emergency services vehicle) in which the he or she is practicing as an EMT. Provides that a First Responder must be at least 16 years of age. Provides that the Department's standards and requirements with respect to vehicle staffing must allow for a person who is not an EMT-B, EMT-I, or EMT-P to serve as the driver of a vehicle covered by a Vehicle Service Provider's license while the vehicle is being used to provide emergency or non-emergency transportation and must provide for the licensure of such a person to serve in that capacity. Amends the Toll Highway Act and the Toll Bridge Act to allow emergency medical services vehicles to use a toll highway or toll bridge without paying a toll.
Title
EMS-VARIOUS-TOLL ROAD/BRIDGE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-17 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1014 |
2012-08-17 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2013 |
2012-08-17 | House | Governor Approved |
2012-06-22 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-24 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2012-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2012 |
2012-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2012 |
2012-05-16 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 008-000-000 |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2012-05-04 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 25, 2012 |
2012-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2012-04-19 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2012-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2012-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 17, 2012 |
2012-04-11 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne Rosenthal |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Barickman |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Evans |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard Morthland |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan |
2012-03-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-001 |
2012-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2012-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2012-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 007-000-000 |
2012-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2012-03-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Chapin Rose |
2012-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-07 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 007-000-001 |
2012-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote |
2012-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2012-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Chapin Rose |
2012-02-27 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2012-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2012-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Chapin Rose |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 50 | 3.50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 50 | 3.55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 50 | 3.60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 50 | 3.85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
605 | 10 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
605 | 115 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |