IL HB5878 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1156
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1156
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Soil and Water Conservation Districts Act. Makes a technical change to a Section concerning the short title.
Title
LOCAL GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Rita [D] | Rep. William Davis [D] | Rep. Al Riley [D] | Sen. Terry Link [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 62 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 62 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1156 |
2015-01-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-12-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-12-04 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-12-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 045-004-000 |
2014-12-04 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading December 2, 2014 |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading November 20, 2014 |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 012-000-000 |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As December 4, 2014 |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2014-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2014-04-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 062-036-000 |
2014-03-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-24 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Mass Transit Committee; 016-000-000 |
2014-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Mass Transit Committee; by Voice Vote |
2014-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Mass Transit Committee |
2014-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
2014-03-13 | House | Assigned to Mass Transit Committee |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 405 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |