IL HB5877 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Racial Impact Note Act. Provides that every bill which has or could have a disparate impact on racial and ethnic minorities, upon the request of any member, shall have prepared for it, before second reading in the house of introduction, a brief explanatory statement or note that shall include a reliable estimate of the anticipated impact on those racial and ethnic minorities likely to be impacted by the bill. Specifies the contents, and provides for the preparation, of each racial impact note. Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Prohibits racial discrimination and harassment by State officers and employees. Provides that each State officer and employee shall annually complete a racial bias, discrimination, and harassment training program approved by the appropriate jurisdictional authority. Expands the jurisdiction of the Executive Ethics Commission to include allegations of racial discrimination and harassment by persons registered under the Lobbyist Registration Act. Provides that the personnel policies of units of local government shall prohibit racial discrimination and harassment. Defines "racial discrimination and harassment". Provides for rulemaking, including emergency rulemaking. Amends the Secretary of State Act. Provides the Secretary of State's Inspector General with jurisdiction to investigate complaints of racial discrimination and harassment by persons registered under the Lobbyist Registration Act. Amends the Lobbyist Registration Act. Prohibits racial discrimination and harassment by persons registered under the Lobbyist Registration Act. Provides that each registered lobbyist shall annually complete a racial bias, discrimination, and harassment training program approved by the Secretary of State. Defines "racial discrimination and harassment". Amends the Illinois Human Rights Act. Requires the Department of Human Rights to establish a racial discrimination and harassment hotline for the anonymous reporting of racial discrimination and harassment in both public and private places of employment, and to provide for reporting by both telephone and Internet. Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act to provide for emergency rulemaking. Effective immediately.
Title
RACIAL DISCRIMINATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-06-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-05-31 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2018-05-28 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-28 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-05-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-05-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-05-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith |
2018-05-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-05-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 004-001-000 |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-22 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-05-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-10 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-05-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 305 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
25 | 170 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
25 | 170 | 4.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 170 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 100 | 5-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 430 | 5-10.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | 5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 430 | 5-70 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | 50-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 430 | 70-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
775 | 5 | 2-108 | New Code | See Bill Text |