IL HB5876 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates $5,400,000 from the Common School Fund to the State Board of Education for the purpose of providing one-time, per capita grants to alternative schools, safe schools, or alternative learning opportunity programs that have experienced average daily attendance growth from Fiscal Year 2017. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$SUPP-STATE BOARD OF EDUCATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-05-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-05-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2018-05-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-10HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-05-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-05-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-05-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback