IL HB5876 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $5,400,000 from the Common School Fund to the State Board of Education for the purpose of providing one-time, per capita grants to alternative schools, safe schools, or alternative learning opportunity programs that have experienced average daily attendance growth from Fiscal Year 2017. Effective immediately.
Title
$SUPP-STATE BOARD OF EDUCATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2018-05-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2018-05-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2018-05-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-10 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-05-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5876&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/PDF/10000HB5876.pdf |