IL HB5875 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates $100,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity for a grant to AllenForce-Veterans Initiative for operational expenses for the fiscal year ending on June 30, 2019 . Effective July 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$DCEO-ALLENFORCE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2018-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2018-05-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2018-05-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback