IL HB5872 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Assembly Compensation Act. Provides that for session days beginning in fiscal year 2020, and for each fiscal year thereafter, (i) the allowance for lodging and meals shall remain $111 per day and (ii) mileage for automobile travel shall be permanently reimbursed at a rate of $0.39 per mile, unless otherwise approved by law. Provides that for non-session days beginning in fiscal year 2020, and for each fiscal year thereafter, mileage reimbursement shall be permanently set at a rate of $0.39 per mile, unless otherwise approved by law. Amends the Compensation Review Act. Provides that members of the General Assembly are prohibited from receiving and shall not receive any increase in compensation that would otherwise apply based on a cost of living adjustment for or during the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2019. Provides that members of the General Assembly are prohibited from receiving and shall not receive any increase in compensation that would otherwise apply based on a cost of living adjustment for terms commencing on or after July 1, 2019, unless otherwise approved by law. Effective immediately.
Title
GA-COLA & PER DIEM FREEZE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 115 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
25 | 120 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5872&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5872.htm |