IL HB5868 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Permits a group or individual policy of accident and health insurance or managed care plan amended, delivered, issued, or renewed on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act to provide coverage for residential extended care services and supports for persons suffering from alcoholism or other drug addiction so long as: (1) a health care clinic or any other specified entity has conducted an individualized assessment of the person's condition prior to discharge and has identified the person as being at risk of a drug or alcohol relapse and in need of supportive services to maintain long-term recovery; (2) the residential extended care services and supports are administered by a community-based agency that is licensed by or under contract with the Department of Human Services; and (3) the residential extended care services and supports are administered upon the referral of a health care clinic or any other specified entity. Sets forth the services available for coverage. Requires the Department of Insurance to rate each community-based agency that is licensed by or under contract with the Department of Human Services to provide residential extended care services and supports and to publish the results on its official website. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Permits the fee-for-service and managed care medical assistance programs established under the Code to provide coverage for residential extended care services and supports for any person suffering from alcoholism or other drug addiction who is at risk of a drug or alcohol relapse following discharge from a health care clinic or any other specified entity. Sets forth the conditions that must be met to qualify for coverage and makes other changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RESIDENTIAL RECOVERY SERVICES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 30, 2018
2018-05-29SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter
2018-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 30, 2018
2018-05-29SenateDo Pass Human Services; 008-000-000
2018-05-28SenateWaive Posting Notice
2018-05-28SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-25SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-25SenateArrive in Senate
2018-05-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-001-000
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
2018-05-23HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2018-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2018-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 016-000-000
2018-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-05-09HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-09HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2018-04-23HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-23HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2155356z.29New CodeSee Bill Text
30555-36New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback