IL HB5868 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-07 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-07 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Real Estate Appraiser Licensing Act of 2002. Provides for the licensure of appraisal companies under the Act. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation shall adopt by rule standards for the licensure of appraisal companies and charge a licensing fee not to exceed $50. Provides conditions for licensure as a real estate appraiser or appraisal company for corporations and partnerships. Prohibits the licensure of limited liability companies. Provides conditional exemptions from the Act to certain persons and entities. Provides criminal penalties for engaging in certain activities without a license as a real estate appraiser or appraisal company. Prohibits certain means of influencing an appraisal. Provides requirements for appraisers concerning the maintenance of a place of business within the State. Specifies that the Board has the power to investigate the actions of a licensee or applicant. Defines "appraisal company", "appraisal management company", "managing appraiser", "turnaround time", and "due date"; requires due dates to be calculated on Central Standard (rather than Daylight Savings) Time. Makes other changes.
Title
REAL ESTATE APPRAISAL COMPANY
Sponsors
Rep. William Davis [D] | Rep. James Durkin [R] | Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] | Rep. Karen May [D] |
Rep. Kevin McCarthy [D] | Rep. Rosemary Mulligan [R] | Rep. Angelo Saviano [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 79 N: 23 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-07 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2010-05-07 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-29 | Postponed - Financial Institutions | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Financial Institutions | |
2010-04-26 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi | |
2010-04-23 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2010 | |
2010-04-22 | Postponed - Financial Institutions | |
2010-04-22 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Financial Institutions | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Financial Institutions | |
2010-04-15 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-15 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link | |
2010-04-15 | Postponed - Financial Institutions | |
2010-04-13 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez | |
2010-04-08 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. M. Maggie Crotty | |
2010-04-06 | Assigned to Financial Institutions | |
2010-04-06 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-06 | First Reading | |
2010-04-06 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff | |
2010-04-06 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terry Link | |
2010-04-06 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-04-06 | Arrive in Senate | |
2010-03-26 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 079-023-000 | |
2010-03-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-25 | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2010-03-25 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2010-03-25 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rosemary Mulligan | |
2010-03-25 | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 012-000-000 | |
2010-03-25 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 012-000-000 | |
2010-03-24 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin | |
2010-03-24 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis | |
2010-03-24 | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee | |
2010-03-24 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee | |
2010-03-23 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen May | |
2010-03-22 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin A. McCarthy | |
2010-03-22 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz | |
2010-03-22 | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-22 | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Angelo Saviano | |
2010-03-19 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-19 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Angelo Saviano | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-10 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 009-000-000 | |
2010-03-10 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2010-03-10 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Business & Occupational Licenses Committee | |
2010-02-16 | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-10 | First Reading | |
2010-02-10 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Angelo Saviano |