IL HB5866 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-08 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-08 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Tax Increment Allocation Redevelopment Act of the Illinois Municipal Code. Creates a tax increment allocation financing extension to the 47th year (currently, the 35th year) for the redevelopment project areas that were established on December 29, 1986 and January 23, 1991 by the City of East St. Louis. Requires adoption of an ordinance extending the completion date and providing notice to the taxing bodies that would otherwise constitute the joint review board. Effective immediately.
Title
TIF-EAST ST LOUIS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-08 | House | First Reading |
2020-12-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 11-74.4-3.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5866&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5866.htm |