IL HB5864 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the Act may be referred to as the Blue Collar Jobs Act. Amends the Illinois Enterprise Zone Act. Creates a High Impact Business construction jobs credit and an Enterprise Zone construction jobs credit against the taxpayer's Illinois income taxes based on the incremental income tax attributable to laborers or workers employed at certain construction sites located in Enterprise Zones. Amends the Economic Development for a Growing Economy Tax Credit Act. Creates a New Construction EDGE Credit based on the incremental income tax attributable to laborers or workers employed at construction sites associated with EDGE projects. Amends the River Edge Redevelopment Zone Act. Creates a River Edge construction jobs credit based on the incremental income tax attributable to laborers or workers employed at certain construction sites in a River Edge Redevelopment Zone. Requires contractors and subcontractors associated with projects that receive credits under the amendatory Act to file certified payroll information with the Department of Labor and the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity.
Title
BLUE COLLAR JOBS ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2018-04-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-19 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2018-04-19 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2018-04-19 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-04-19 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2018-04-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 655 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 655 | 5.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 10 | 5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 10 | 5-51 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 10 | 5-56 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 5 | 201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 211 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 221 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 115 | 10-10.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 115 | 10-10.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 115 | 10-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5864&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5864.htm |