IL HB5861 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-11-16 - Fiscal Note Filed
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unemployment Insurance Act to provide that if an individual's benefit year begins on or after March 8, 2020, but before the week following the last week of a disaster period established by the gubernatorial disaster proclamations in response to COVID-19, recovery by suit in the name of the People of the State of Illinois or recoupment from benefits payable to an individual for any week shall be permanently waived if the sum was received by the individual without fault on his or her part. Provides that, in cases of such permanent waiver of recovery or recoupment, the Director of Employment Security may not request the Comptroller or the Secretary of the Treasury to withhold a sum of benefits for which an individual is found to be ineligible. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UNEMPLOYMENT-RECOUPMENT WAIVER

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-16HouseFiscal Note Filed
2020-11-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2020-11-10HouseFirst Reading
2020-11-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2020-11-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2020-11-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
820405900Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback