IL HB5859 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Downstate Police and Firefighter Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that the pension board shall provide notice of each meeting to the mayor or president of the board of trustees of the municipality at least 48 hours prior to that meeting. Provides that if the board fails to provide that notice for any meeting, then any action taken at that meeting is invalid. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PENCD-DNST POL&FIRE-OPEN MTG

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-03HouseSession Sine Die
2014-03-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2014-02-24HouseAssigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee
2014-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2014-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2014-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jeanne M Ives

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4053-143.5New CodeSee Bill Text
4054-134.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback