IL HB5859 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, if a board of review or the Property Tax Appeal Board fails to reach a decision within 6 months after receiving the taxpayer's timely filed complaint, then the State automatically defaults under the complaint, and judgment in favor of the taxpayer shall be entered. Provides that the judgment shall be final and unappealable.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-BD OF REVIEW-DECISION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-01-08HouseSession Sine Die
2012-03-09HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2012-02-27HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2012-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2012-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2012-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Chapin Rose

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520016-17New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback