IL HB5856 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Toll Highway Act. Provides that vehicles owned or operated by a Mass Transit District created under a provision of the Local Mass Transit District Act may use any toll highway without paying a toll.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PUBLIC TRANSIT TOLL EXEMPTION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-29HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 107-000-000
2018-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-25HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-05-22HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-22HouseArrived in House
2018-05-22SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-001
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018
2018-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass as Amended Transportation; 017-000-000
2018-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2018-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Transportation
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-004-000
2018-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Tollway Oversight Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2018-04-16HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-04-16HouseAssigned to Tollway Oversight Committee
2018-04-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-09HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-05HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Nicholas K Smith

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6051019Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback