IL HB5845 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State University Certificates of Participation Act. Provides that the Act applies under December 31, 2023 (rather than December 31, 2014). Amends the University of Illinois Act and the Northern Illinois University Law. Under an Investment, Performance, and Accountability Commitment at each University, requires each University to comply with certain tuition and mandatory fee, financial aid, and performance goal provisions if the University is appropriated a certain amount of money each fiscal year. Provides for an annual report, and repeals the Commitment on June 30, 2023. Subject to appropriation, provides for an Excellence Program at each University to recruit and retain promising faculty throughout the University through capital investments; amends the State Finance Act to create a special fund. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HIGHER ED-UOFI/NIU COMMITMENT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2018-05-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-05-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-05-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-05-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-05-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-04-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-03-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-03-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-03-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
110305100New CodeSee Bill Text
110305105New CodeSee Bill Text
11068530-205New CodeSee Bill Text
11068530-210New CodeSee Bill Text
1107390Amended CodeCitation Text
301055.886New CodeSee Bill Text
301056z-105New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback