IL HB5830 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. In provisions concerning voter registration, provides that an identification card issued by a unit of local government is not an acceptable form of identification. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELEC CD-LOCAL IDENTIFICATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2018-03-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-03-06HouseFirst Reading
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2018-03-05HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jeanne M Ives

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1054-10Amended CodeCitation Text
1055-9Amended CodeCitation Text
1056-37Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback