IL HB5829 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on October 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-16 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-16 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Motor Fuel Tax Law. Provides that an increase in the rate of tax based on the change in the Consumer Price Index shall not occur until July 1, 2023 (currently, January 1, 2023). Repeals a requirement that retailers of motor fuel shall cause a notice to be placed on retail dispensing devices. Effective immediately.
Title
MOTOR FUEL-NO CPI INCREASE
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Bos [R] | Rep. Joe Sosnowski [R] | Rep. Amy Grant [R] | Rep. Dan Caulkins [R] |
Rep. Paul Jacobs [R] | Sen. Andrew Chesney [R] | Rep. Martin McLaughlin [R] | Rep. Sandra Hamilton [R] |
Rep. Brad Halbrook [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-11-16 | House | First Reading |
2022-11-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2022-11-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra Hamilton |
2022-11-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2022-11-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2022-10-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2022-10-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2022-10-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2022-10-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2022-10-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Chris Bos |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 505 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5829&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB5829.htm |