IL HB5828 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-10)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates $5,797,550 from the Build Illinois Bond Fund to the Capital Development Board for early childhood construction grants. Appropriates $1,375,000 from the Build Illinois Bond Fund to the Capital Development Board for a grant to Gads Hill Center for an early childhood center located in Brighton Park and other capital improvements. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$CDB-EARLY CHILDHOOD

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 017-001-000
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2018-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-03-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-03-01HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-03-01HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-28HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback