IL HB5825 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-17 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Joe Sosnowski
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides for filing of aviation fuel tax returns by retailers selling aviation fuel. Provides that if a municipality or business district doesn't certify that it has an airport-related purpose, the municipality's or district's local share of aviation fuel proceeds may not be distributed to the municipality or district. Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that funds received by a municipality from the imposition of taxes on the sale or use of aviation fuel may be used only for to expenditures for airport-related purposes. Defines "airport-related purposes". Provides that beginning July 1, 2018, the Department of Revenue shall certify to a municipality receiving distributions of use or occupation taxes imposed on aviation fuel the amount of tax attributed to aviation fuel sales as reported by retailers on aviation fuel tax returns to the Department of Revenue. Requires municipalities and business districts to certify whether the municipality has an airport-related purpose before imposing an occupation or use tax. Provides that beginning July 1, 2018, a municipality shall certify annually to the Department of Revenue that all of the municipality's expenditures of tax revenues generated from the sale or use of aviation fuel that were received on or after July 1, 2018 were devoted to airport-related purposes. Provides that the Department of Revenue shall provide forms and adopt rules for the filing of the certification. Limits the provisions' applicability only for so long as the revenue use requirements of specified federal statutes are binding on the State. Limits home rule powers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MUNI-AVIATION FUEL REVENUE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-17HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-12HouseTo Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-02-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-27HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-27HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
351059.5New CodeSee Bill Text
351109.5New CodeSee Bill Text
351159.5New CodeSee Bill Text
351203.5New CodeSee Bill Text
6558-11-22New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback