IL HB5824 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on August 24 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-14 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Higher Education Supplier Diversity Act. Provides that every private institution of higher education approved by the Illinois Student Assistance Commission for the purposes of the Monetary Award Program shall submit a report on its voluntary supplier diversity program to the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity. Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Creates the Office of Diversity and Economic Inclusion within the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity to assist diverse businesses through targeted programs, matchmaking workshops, resources, and outreach and promotional activities. Amends the Department of Central Management Services Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Repeals a provision concerning the higher education supplier diversity report. Amends the Economic Development for a Growing Economy Tax Credit Act. Provides that a taxpayer shall not receive a credit under the Act unless the taxpayer submits a required supplier diversity report. Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides for insurance company supplier diversity reports. Defines terms. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DCEO-SUPPLIER DIVERSITY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2020-08-31HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2020-08-31HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2020-08-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2020-08-28HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2020-08-24HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20405405-530Repealed CodeCitation Text
20605605-1055New CodeSee Bill Text
2155155.47New CodeSee Bill Text
30555-30.13Amended CodeCitation Text
35105-57Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback