IL HB5823 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates $4,500,000 from the Supreme Court Historic Preservation Fund to the Supreme Court Historic Preservation Commission for Historic Preservation Purposes. Appropriates $ 2,0 00,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Supreme Court Historic Preservation Fund. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$SUPREME COURT HISTORIC

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee
2018-02-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-27HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-23HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback