IL HB5814 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-7)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1064
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971. Provides that interest penalties that may be payable under the Act, as provided under specified Sections of the Illinois Insurance Code, shall be paid from a separate appropriation from each fund for such purpose and for each appropriated agency. Amends the State Budget Law. Provides that for the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2018, and for each fiscal year thereafter, the budget shall include a separate line item request appropriating moneys to each State agency for estimated costs for each fund under the State Prompt Payment Act and specified Sections of the Illinois Insurance Code. Amends the State Finance Act. Provides that the sum of transfers among line item appropriations for an agency in a fiscal year shall not exceed 2% of the aggregate amount appropriated to it within the same treasury fund for, among other objects, late interest penalties under the State Prompt Payment Act and specified Sections of the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that if lump sum appropriations are enacted with a separate line item for late interest penalties under the State Prompt Payment Act and the Illinois Insurance Code, the 2% transfer authority shall apply to the aggregate amount of these appropriations. Amends the State Prompt Payment Act to provide that interest penalties that may be payable under the Act and under specified Sections of the Illinois Insurance Code shall be paid from a separate appropriation from each fund for such purpose and for each appropriated agency. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROMPT PAYMNT-INTEREST PENALTY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1064
2018-08-24HouseEffective Date August 24, 2018
2018-08-24HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-27HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2018-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateDo Pass State Government; 006-000-000
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-04-30SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-04-27SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-04-20HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-04-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-04-20HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-04-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-04-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-000-000
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-04-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2018-04-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2018-04-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney
2018-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
152038.1Amended CodeCitation Text
152050-10Amended CodeCitation Text
3010513.2Amended CodeCitation Text
305403-6New CodeSee Bill Text
53756.12Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback