IL HB5812 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0582
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. With regard to property tax relief pool grants, provides that each year, the State Board of Education shall set a threshold above which a school district may apply for property tax relief. Provides that the intended relief may not be greater than 1% of the EAV for a unit district, 0.69% of the EAV for an elementary school district, or 0.31% of the EAV for a high school district; defines "EAV". Provides that the total property tax relief allowable to a school district shall be calculated based on the total amount of reduction in the school district's aggregate extension. With regard to evidence-based funding, provides that when a school district withdraws from a special education cooperative, the portion of the base funding minimum that is attributable to the school district may be redistributed to the school district upon withdrawal. Provides that the school district and the cooperative must include the amount of the base funding minimum that is to be re-apportioned in their withdrawal agreement and notify the State Board of Education of the change with a copy of the agreement upon withdrawal. Repeals a provision governing the basis for apportionment of general State financial aid and supplemental general State aid to the common schools for the 1998-1999 through the 2016-2017 school years. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-EVIDENCE-BASED FUNDING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 76 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-23HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0582
2018-03-23HouseEffective Date March 23, 2018
2018-03-23HouseGovernor Approved
2018-03-15HouseSent to the Governor
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-03-14HousePassed Both Houses
2018-03-14SenateThird Reading - Passed; 038-017-000
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-03-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2018
2018-03-13SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-03-13SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-03-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-03-09SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-09SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2018-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-03-09SenateArrive in Senate
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-03-07HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 076-031-000
2018-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-06HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-06HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-06HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-06HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 017-003-001
2018-02-27HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105518-8.05Repealed CodeCitation Text
105518-8.15Amended CodeCitation Text
10552-3.170Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback